AR HB1877 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1877 is now Act 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Definition Of "home-brewed Beer"; And To Authorize A Manufacturer Of Home-brewed Beer To Remove Home-brewed Beer From The Manufacturer's Premises For Personal Or Family Use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Definition Of "home-brewed Beer"; And To Authorize A Manufacturer Of Home-brewed Beer To Remove Home-brewed Beer From The Manufacturer's Premises For Personal Or Family Use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseNotification that HB1877 is now Act 861
2019-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-03-19HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback