AR HB1875 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1875 is now Act 811
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Earn And Learn Act; And To Allow Individuals To Work And Earn A Paycheck While Also Fulfilling Licensing Requirements And Gaining The Skills To Fill The Needs Of An Expanding Workforce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Earn And Learn Act; And To Allow Individuals To Work And Earn A Paycheck While Also Fulfilling Licensing Requirements And Gaining The Skills To Fill The Needs Of An Expanding Workforce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseNotification that HB1875 is now Act 811
2021-04-20HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-19HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-19SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback