AR HB1871 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1871 is now Act 1477
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1871 is now Act 1477
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Funding Provided By The Division Of Aging And Adult Services Of The Department Of Human Services.
Title
Concerning Funding Provided By The Division Of Aging And Adult Services Of The Department Of Human Services.
Sponsors
Rep. James Word [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 55 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 55 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1871 is now Act 1477 |
2013-04-18 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-17 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Return to the House as Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-12 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |