AR HB1866 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Executive Clemency, Pardon, And Commutation Of Sentence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Executive Clemency, Pardon, And Commutation Of Sentence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-10SenateThe vote by which HB1866 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-04-10SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-04-10SenateReturned From the House as requested.
2019-04-10HouseReturned To the Senate as requested.
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate having failed to pass.
2019-04-09SenateReturned To the House as Failed to Pass
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-27SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback