AR HB1866 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Exempt Certain Information Pertaining To A Law Enforcement Officer From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And Concerning Public Record Websites.
Title
To Exempt Certain Information Pertaining To A Law Enforcement Officer From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And Concerning Public Record Websites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in House at Sine Die |
2017-04-03 | House | Member's withdrawal of own Bill - HB1866 was objected to |
2017-03-30 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The vote by which HB 1866 PASSED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |