AR HB1855 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1855 is now Act 859
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Permits For The Hauling Of Agronomic Or Horticultural Crops In Their Natural State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Permits For The Hauling Of Agronomic Or Horticultural Crops In Their Natural State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseNotification that HB1855 is now Act 859
2019-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2019-03-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback