AR HB1855 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB1855 is now Act 988
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB1855 is now Act 988
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning School Choice For Foster Children.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning School Choice For Foster Children.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Notification that HB1855 is now Act 988 |
2017-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-09 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-02 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |