AR HB1850 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1850 is now Act 1055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Empower Independent Contractors Act Of 2019; To Amend Portions Of The Law Impacting Initiated Act 4 Of 1948; And To Amend Definitions Of "employee", "employment", And "employment Status" Within Title 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Empower Independent Contractors Act Of 2019; To Amend Portions Of The Law Impacting Initiated Act 4 Of 1948; And To Amend Definitions Of "employee", "employment", And "employment Status" Within Title 11.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseNotification that HB1850 is now Act 1055
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-09SenateThe vote by which HB1850 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-04-09SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-15HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback