AR HB1849 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1849 is now Act 1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1849 is now Act 1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning When A Vehicle May Be Driven Upon The Left Lane Of A Multilane Highway.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning When A Vehicle May Be Driven Upon The Left Lane Of A Multilane Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Notification that HB1849 is now Act 1090 |
2021-04-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-31 | House | Filed |