AR HB1849 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Permanent Automobile Licensing Act Of 1967; And To Suspend The Annual Motor Vehicle Registration Requirement In Certain Situations.
Title
To Amend The Permanent Automobile Licensing Act Of 1967; And To Suspend The Annual Motor Vehicle Registration Requirement In Certain Situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed |