AR HB1847 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1847 is now Act 858
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1847 is now Act 858
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise Design And Construction Standards Regarding Site Selection For A Public School District Facility To Include A Traffic Impact Analysis.
Title
To Revise Design And Construction Standards Regarding Site Selection For A Public School District Facility To Include A Traffic Impact Analysis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1847 is now Act 858 |
2019-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-29 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed |