AR HB1846 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1846 is now Act 795
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Arkansas Grain Grading Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Arkansas Grain Grading Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseNotification that HB1846 is now Act 795
2019-04-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-01SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback