AR HB1845 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Sales And Use Tax Levied On The Purchase Of A Motor Vehicle, Trailer, Or Semitrailer When A Used Motor Vehicle, Trailer, Or Semitrailer Is Transferred As Part Of An Insurance Settlement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Sales And Use Tax Levied On The Purchase Of A Motor Vehicle, Trailer, Or Semitrailer When A Used Motor Vehicle, Trailer, Or Semitrailer Is Transferred As Part Of An Insurance Settlement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-03SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-04-03SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback