AR HB1842 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1842 is now Act 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Streamline The Grievance Process For State Employees; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Procedures, Factors To Be Considered, And Standard Of Review For Grievances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Streamline The Grievance Process For State Employees; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Procedures, Factors To Be Considered, And Standard Of Review For Grievances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 65 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseNotification that HB1842 is now Act 1054
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback