AR HB1834 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A City Of The First Class Or The Second Class To Authorize By Ordinance The Issuance Of Alcoholic Beverage Control Board Permits To Restaurants For The Sale Of Mixed Drinks.
Title
To Allow A City Of The First Class Or The Second Class To Authorize By Ordinance The Issuance Of Alcoholic Beverage Control Board Permits To Restaurants For The Sale Of Mixed Drinks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-09 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |