AR HB1832 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Notification that HB1832 is now Act 959
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require That Public Schools Observe A Moment Of Silence Following The Daily Recitation Of The Pledge Of Allegiance; And To Require That Public Schools Recite The Pledge Of Allegiance At School Assemblies And Sporting Events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require That Public Schools Observe A Moment Of Silence Following The Daily Recitation Of The Pledge Of Allegiance; And To Require That Public Schools Recite The Pledge Of Allegiance At School Assemblies And Sporting Events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseNotification that HB1832 is now Act 959
2021-04-21HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-20HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-20HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-20SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback