AR HB1832 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1832 is now Act 1474
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1832 is now Act 1474
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
The New Markets Jobs Act Of 2013.
Title
The New Markets Jobs Act Of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1832 is now Act 1474 |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-19 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-19 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-19 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 and 2. |
2013-04-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and 2. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1and 2 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |