AR HB1829 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1829 is now Act 793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize And Encourage The Arkansas State Game And Fish Commission To Establish An Anatomical Gift Option For Arkansas Residents Obtaining A Hunting Or Fishing License Through The Commission's Online Sales System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize And Encourage The Arkansas State Game And Fish Commission To Establish An Anatomical Gift Option For Arkansas Residents Obtaining A Hunting Or Fishing License Through The Commission's Online Sales System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseNotification that HB1829 is now Act 793
2019-04-04HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-03HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-02HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-01SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-01SenateAmendment #1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted.
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback