AR HB1828 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Parent-child Intrastate Relocation Act; And To Amend The Law Concerning Whether Or Not A Change Of Principal Place Of Residence Of A Child Is In The Best Interest Of The Child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Parent-child Intrastate Relocation Act; And To Amend The Law Concerning Whether Or Not A Change Of Principal Place Of Residence Of A Child Is In The Best Interest Of The Child.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseRecommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-09HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-03-19HouseRe-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback