AR HB1827 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The License Fees For A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun.
Title
Concerning The License Fees For A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-14 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-02 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1827 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB1827.pdf |