AR HB1822 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1822 is now Act 1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1822 is now Act 1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Operation Of Autonomous Vehicles At Railroad Crossings; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Concerning The Operation Of Autonomous Vehicles At Railroad Crossings; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Notification that HB1822 is now Act 1052 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-09 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-04-09 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-05 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed |