AR HB1821 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For Medicaid Reimbursement Rates That Address The Minimum Wage Increases; To Provide For Immediate And Ongoing Regular Reviews Of Medicaid Reimbursement Rates And Methodologies; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Provide For Medicaid Reimbursement Rates That Address The Minimum Wage Increases; To Provide For Immediate And Ongoing Regular Reviews Of Medicaid Reimbursement Rates And Methodologies; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Extract from Commitee (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion to Extracat HB1821 from Commitee Failed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion to Extract from Commitee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed |