AR HB1818 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Parts Purchased To Repair Agricultural Equipment And Machinery And Timber Equipment And Machinery.
Title
To Create A Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Parts Purchased To Repair Agricultural Equipment And Machinery And Timber Equipment And Machinery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-04-27 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-04-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-19 | House | Filed |