AR HB1815 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1815 is now Act 813
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1815 is now Act 813
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Dependency-neglect Petitions, Hearings, And The Termination Of Parental Rights As It Relates To A Putative Parent Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Dependency-neglect Petitions, Hearings, And The Termination Of Parental Rights As It Relates To A Putative Parent Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Notification that HB1815 is now Act 813 |
2021-04-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed |