AR HB1809 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1809 is now Act 1046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1809 is now Act 1046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create An Additional Term Of Imprisonment For Offenses That Constitute Serious Acts Of Violence Against A Person At A Church Or Other Place Of Worship.
Title
To Create An Additional Term Of Imprisonment For Offenses That Constitute Serious Acts Of Violence Against A Person At A Church Or Other Place Of Worship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Notification that HB1809 is now Act 1046 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed |