AR HB1808 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1808 is now Act 764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1808 is now Act 764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal Uncodified Acts 2015, No. 863 Concerning Participation In Interscholastic Activities.
Title
To Repeal Uncodified Acts 2015, No. 863 Concerning Participation In Interscholastic Activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1808 is now Act 764 |
2019-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed |