AR HB1800 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Plant Act Of 1917; To Require The State Plant Board To Consider Certain Data Related To Dicamba And To Set A Cutoff Date For The Use Of Dicamba Within A Specific Date Range.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Plant Act Of 1917; To Require The State Plant Board To Consider Certain Data Related To Dicamba And To Set A Cutoff Date For The Use Of Dicamba Within A Specific Date Range.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 40 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseDied in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
2023-04-04HouseRead the third time and failed.
2023-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2023-03-30HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback