AR HB1794 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that HB1794 is now Act 757
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Licensed Practical Nurse Pathway Pilot Program; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Licensed Practical Nurse Pathway Pilot Program; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseNotification that HB1794 is now Act 757
2021-04-15HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-14HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-14SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-07SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-07HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-29HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback