AR HB1793 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that HB1793 is now Act 1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that HB1793 is now Act 1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring A Correctional Or Detention Facility Operated By The Department Of Corrections To Establish A Policy To Offer Mammograms And Prostate Screenings To Inmates And Detainees, As Appropriate.
Title
Requiring A Correctional Or Detention Facility Operated By The Department Of Corrections To Establish A Policy To Offer Mammograms And Prostate Screenings To Inmates And Detainees, As Appropriate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Notification that HB1793 is now Act 1107 |
2021-04-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-22 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed |