AR HB1793 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Notification that HB1793 is now Act 912
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Notification that HB1793 is now Act 912
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Panel On Data Transparency; And To Create The Positions Of Chief Data Officer And Chief Privacy Officer Within The Department Of Information Systems.
Title
To Create A Panel On Data Transparency; And To Create The Positions Of Chief Data Officer And Chief Privacy Officer Within The Department Of Information Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1793 is now Act 912 |
2017-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |