AR HB1789 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1789 is now Act 1469
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow Home-schooled Students To Participate In Interscholastic Activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow Home-schooled Students To Participate In Interscholastic Activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-22HouseNotification that HB1789 is now Act 1469
2013-04-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-18HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2013-04-18HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2013-04-16HouseRe-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-16HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-16SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-16SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-16SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-16SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-12SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-04-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2013-04-10SenateReceived from the House.
2013-04-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-04HouseAmendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-03HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-28HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-20HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-03-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback