AR HB1787 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Renewable Energy Development Act Of 2001; To Modify The Authority Of The Arkansas Public Service Commission; And To Modify Net-metering Facilities For Just Compensation To Arkansas Customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Renewable Energy Development Act Of 2001; To Modify The Authority Of The Arkansas Public Service Commission; And To Modify Net-metering Facilities For Just Compensation To Arkansas Customers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-06HouseAmendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-01HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-29HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-23HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-23HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-23HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2021-03-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1787&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1787/HB1787031820211034.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1787/HB1787032320210924.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1787/HB1787032920211243.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1787/HB1787040120211146.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1787/HB1787040620210948.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1787-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1787-H2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1787-H3.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1787-H4.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback