AR HB1787 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1787 is now Act 1349
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1787 is now Act 1349
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Granting Representative Authority To The Arkansas State Game And Fish Commission For Governmental Cooperation With Wildlife Purposes.
Title
Granting Representative Authority To The Arkansas State Game And Fish Commission For Governmental Cooperation With Wildlife Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Notification that HB1787 is now Act 1349 |
2013-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-12 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-11 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |