AR HB1782 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Student Restraints In Public Schools Or Educational Settings.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Student Restraints In Public Schools Or Educational Settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-29 | House | Filed |