AR HB1781 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that HB1781 is now Act 758
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify And Expand The Prescription Limitations In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify And Expand The Prescription Limitations In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseNotification that HB1781 is now Act 758
2021-04-15HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-14HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-06SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-05HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-03-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback