AR HB1780 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Notification that HB1780 is now Act 769
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Notification that HB1780 is now Act 769
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The House Of Representatives And The Senate To Establish The People First Advisory Legislative Session Concerning Disability Issues.
Title
To Require The House Of Representatives And The Senate To Establish The People First Advisory Legislative Session Concerning Disability Issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1780 is now Act 769 |
2013-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |