AR HB1773 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Notification that HB1773 is now Act 973
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Crump's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crump's Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseNotification that HB1773 is now Act 973
2019-04-09HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-08HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-08HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-04-03HouseRe-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-03HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-03SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-25HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback