AR HB1772 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1772 is now Act 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Psychological And Neuropsychological Testing Workforce Scholarship, Stipend, And Incentive Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Psychological And Neuropsychological Testing Workforce Scholarship, Stipend, And Incentive Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseNotification that HB1772 is now Act 842
2023-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-07HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-04-07SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-04-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-04-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-04-04SenateReceived from the House.
2023-04-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2023-03-29HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-03-29HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback