AR HB1770 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1770 is now Act 1069
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1770 is now Act 1069
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That Certain Information Be Included On Student Identification Cards Or Identification Badges.
Title
To Require That Certain Information Be Included On Student Identification Cards Or Identification Badges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Notification that HB1770 is now Act 1069 |
2021-04-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2 |
2021-04-22 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and 2 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1 and #2. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed |