AR HB1769 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Animal Abuse Registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Animal Abuse Registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 46 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in the House at Sine Die
2017-03-13HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2017-03-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback