AR HB1768 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Notification that HB1768 is now Act 918
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Revise The Procedure Of The Commissioner Of State Lands For The Redemption Of Land Certified To The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Revise The Procedure Of The Commissioner Of State Lands For The Redemption Of Land Certified To The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseNotification that HB1768 is now Act 918
2019-04-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-05HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-04-01HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-04-01HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-01SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback