AR HB1765 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1765 is now Act 840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Arkansas Towing And Recovery Board To Establish Rules Necessary For The Towing, Recovery, And Storage Of Electric Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Arkansas Towing And Recovery Board To Establish Rules Necessary For The Towing, Recovery, And Storage Of Electric Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseNotification that HB1765 is now Act 840
2023-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-07HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-04-07SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-04-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-04-03SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2023-04-03SenateReceived from the House.
2023-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2023-03-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback