AR HB1765 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1765 is now Act 1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Uniform Directed Trust Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Uniform Directed Trust Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseNotification that HB1765 is now Act 1021
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-10HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-04-05HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-05HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-05SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback