AR HB1761 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Instructional Materials In Public Schools That Are Related To Race And Ethnicity.
Title
Concerning Instructional Materials In Public Schools That Are Related To Race And Ethnicity.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed |