AR HB1754 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1754 is now Act 1215
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1754 is now Act 1215
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Technical Corrections To The Law Concerning The Use Of Paper Ballots Or Electronic Voting Machines In A School Election.
Title
To Make Technical Corrections To The Law Concerning The Use Of Paper Ballots Or Electronic Voting Machines In A School Election.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary L. Slinkard [R] | Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Rep. Charles Armstrong [D] | Rep. Les Carnine [R] |
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Dan Douglas [R] | Rep. Jody Dickinson [D] | Rep. Allen Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1754 is now Act 1215 |
2013-04-11 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |