AR HB1750 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1750 is now Act 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1750 is now Act 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Ensure That The General Assembly Has Adequate Information To Make Informed Decisions On Highway Funding Before Each Regular Session And Each Fiscal Session.
Title
To Ensure That The General Assembly Has Adequate Information To Make Informed Decisions On Highway Funding Before Each Regular Session And Each Fiscal Session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1750 is now Act 789 |
2019-04-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-03 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-01 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |