AR HB1746 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Notification that HB1746 is now Act 957
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish Annalynn's Law; To Amend The Cosmetology Act; And To Exempt Certain Individuals And Establishments From Licensure By The Cosmetology Technical Advisory Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish Annalynn's Law; To Amend The Cosmetology Act; And To Exempt Certain Individuals And Establishments From Licensure By The Cosmetology Technical Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseNotification that HB1746 is now Act 957
2021-04-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-22HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-22HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-22SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-13HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-03-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-16HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback