AR HB1746 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1746 is now Act 1212
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Require A Mental Health Services Provider To Warn A Law Enforcement Agency Of A Credible Threat By A Patient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require A Mental Health Services Provider To Warn A Law Enforcement Agency Of A Credible Threat By A Patient.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-12HouseNotification that HB1746 is now Act 1212
2013-04-11HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-10HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2013-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2013-04-08HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-08HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-06SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-06SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-13SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-13SenateReceived from the House.
2013-03-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback