AR HB1741 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1741 is now Act 798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1741 is now Act 798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Conditions Of Release On Bail For Persons Arrested For Human Trafficking-related Offenses.
Title
Concerning Conditions Of Release On Bail For Persons Arrested For Human Trafficking-related Offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Notification that HB1741 is now Act 798 |
2021-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-15 | House | Filed |