AR HB1739 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1739 is now Act 799
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Violation Of A No Contact Order Issued By A Court In Relation To Certain Offenses, Including Sex Trafficking-related And Terroristic Threatening Offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Violation Of A No Contact Order Issued By A Court In Relation To Certain Offenses, Including Sex Trafficking-related And Terroristic Threatening Offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseNotification that HB1739 is now Act 799
2021-04-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-15HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-15HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-15SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-05SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-01HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-03-15HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-15HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback